Chen et al v. PMC Bancorp et al

Plaintiff: Yueh Chen and Chen C. Wu
Defendant: PMC Bancorp, 01Homeloan, One West Bank, Fidelity National Title Company, NDEX West, LLC, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv02704
Filed: December 3, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 23, 2010 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The (Doc. # 59 ) Motion for Judgment on the Second Amended Complaint is granted. The Second Amended Complaint is dismissed without prejudice as to Defendants OneWest Bank, FSB, NDEX West, LLC, and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 7/23/2010. (mdc)
May 28, 2010 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint, Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings and Ex Parte Application to Hear Motions Together. It is Hereby Ordered that the Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint is Granted 38 . No later than fourteen (14) days from the date this Order is filed, Plaintiffs shall file the proposed Second Amended Complaint which is attached to the Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint. The Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings are Denied 30 , 33 . The Ex Parte Application to Hear Motions Together is Denied as Moot 39 . Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 5/28/10. (lao)
February 16, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. 18 ) is denied. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 2/16/2010. (mdc) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chen et al v. PMC Bancorp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yueh Chen
Represented By: Kent C Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chen C. Wu
Represented By: Kent C Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PMC Bancorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 01Homeloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One West Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity National Title Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDEX West, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?