RQ Construction, Inc. v. Ecolite Concrete U.S.A., Inc. et al

Plaintiff: RQ Construction, Inc.
Defendant: Ecolite Concrete U.S.A., Inc., Ecolite International, Inc., Brian Smith and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv02728
Filed: December 4, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Referring Judge: William V. Gallo
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2012 217 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part Defendant Smith's 193 Motion to Re-Tax costs. RQ's recoverable costs are reduced by $7,710.88, and $10,656.88 in costs shall be taxed in favor of RQ. Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees 212 is denied. Defendant's tolling motion 216 is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 12/7/12. (kaj)
October 5, 2010 35 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended ORDER Granting 33 Joint Motion to Stay Discovery and to Extend Related Discovery Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 10/5/2010.(knh)
September 10, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint; plaintiff may file a First Amended Complaint in substantially the same form as that attached to its motion, on or before September 20, 2010; additionally, plaintiff must serve defendants its amended Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures no later than September 30, 2010. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 9/8/10. (kaj)
August 4, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Defendants' Request for Protective Order Quashing or Limiting Scope of the Third Party Subpoenas (Doc. No. 25 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/4/2010. (knh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RQ Construction, Inc. v. Ecolite Concrete U.S.A., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RQ Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Davide Golia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ecolite Concrete U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ecolite International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?