Quinones et al v. Chase Bank USA, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Mario B. Quinones and Mario I. Quinones
Defendant: Chase Bank USA, N.A. and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv02748
Filed: December 9, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 1, 2012 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 159 Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Stay Enforcement of Court's Order Without Posting a Bond. The Court Grants Defendants ex parte application to stay enforcement of the Courts order granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs motion for attorneys fees without posting a bond until May 24, 2012. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 5/1/12. (ecs)(jrd)
April 27, 2012 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 155 Defendants' Ex Parte Motion to Confirm Statutory Stay of Execution Without Posting Bond. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 04/24/12. (cge)(jrd)
December 16, 2011 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff Mario B.'s 67 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 12/14/11. (cge)
November 22, 2011 132 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED the Court grants Defendants motion to vacate the Clerks Judgment filed on September 27, 2011. The Court also grants Defendants motion for reconsideration as to money had and received as to the acc ount ending in 5520. Judgment is in favor of Defendant Chase Bank USA, N.A. against Mario I. Quinones in the amount of the principal owed on account 5520 and Chase shall be entitled to the legal rate of interest of 7% as of the date of default. The Court denies Defendants motion for reconsiderationas to the counterclaims for breach of contract as to the 6183 and 5520 accounts. The Court also denies without prejudice Plaintiff Mario I. Quinones motion for attorneys fees.(cge)
September 27, 2011 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 1) granting Defendant's Amended Motion for Summary Judgment as to Mario I.; 2) denying Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment as to its Counterclaim against Mario I. for Breach of Contract; 3) granting Defendant's Motion for Sum mary Judgment as to its Counterclaim against Mario I. for Money had and received; and 4) granting Defendant's Motion to Enforce Judgment entered pursuant to Rule 68 Offer of Judgment re 63 , 71 , 98 . Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 09/26/11. (cge)
October 22, 2010 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 48 Application to Amend Case Management Order; Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 10/22/10. (kaj)(jrl).
October 13, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute 47 ; the Court finds the letter at issue non-privileged; therefore, the Court denies defendant's request for an order requiring plaintiffs' counsel to return the letter and any copies made; Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 10/13/10. (kaj)
June 28, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on defendant's motion to dismiss 15 ; Chases motion to dismiss the Plaintiffs FDCPA claim is granted, and the claim is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 6/24/10. (kaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quinones et al v. Chase Bank USA, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario B. Quinones
Represented By: Douglas Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario I. Quinones
Represented By: Douglas Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Wendy Chai Krog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?