Micha v. Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada et al

Plaintiff: John Paul Micha
Defendant: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada and Group Disability Benefits Plan for Gynecologic Oncology Associates Partners, LLC
Case Number: 3:2009cv02753
Filed: December 9, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Orange
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2015 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Defendant Group Disability Benefits Plan for Gynecologic Oncology Associates Partners, LLC's 91 Motion for Attorney's Fees. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 9/30/2015. (rlu)
May 2, 2011 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding Motions to determine Scope of Review re Doc. Nos. 34 and 35 . The court hereby Denies Sun Life's motion to determine the scope of review (Doc. No. 34 ), and grants in part and denies in part Plaintiff's cross motion (Doc . No. 35 ). However, in granting in part Plaintiff's motion, the court admits only a very limited portion of the evidence offerednamely the records of Dr. Haskell pre-dating the Final Denial that were not sought by Sun Life as part of its appea l process and the January 2009 IME by Dr. Chaiken. All other evidence is to be excluded for the time being, although the court may later find it necessary to admit some or all of it in conducting its de novo review. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 5/2/11. (lao)
April 14, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 17 application to permit telephonic appearance at the ENE Conference and rescheduling ENE to June 2, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. in the chambers of the Honorable Jan M. Adler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 4/14/2010. (tkl) (jrl).
February 12, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Group Disability Benefits Plan for Gynecologic Oncology Associates Partners, LLC answer due 2/24/2010. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 2/12/2010. (tkl) (jrl).
January 25, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to complaint. Dft Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada answer due 2/24/2010. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 1/25/2010. (tkl) (jrl).
December 15, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Motion to Strike the Complaint. Furthermore, Plaintiff is granted leave to refile the complaint nunc pro tunc without the inadvertent inclusion. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 12/15/09. (tkl) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Micha v. Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Paul Micha
Represented By: Susan Lee Horner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Group Disability Benefits Plan for Gynecologic Oncology Associates Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?