Sorrels et al v. J.P. Morgan Chase National Corporate Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: James Sorrels and Jodi Sorrels
Defendant: EMC Mortgage Corporation, Equipoint Financial Network, Inc, J.P. Morgan Chase National Corporate Services, Inc. and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv02884
Filed: December 23, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 14, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting (Doc. 14 ) Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Granting Leave To Amend. Defendants JP Morgan and EMC's motion to dismiss is Granted without prejudice. Plaintiffs are Granted leave to file a First Amended Complaint no later than February 28, 2011. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 2/14/2011. (srm)
February 3, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting With Prejudice (Doc. 10 ) Defendant Equipoint's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 2/3/2011. (srm)
January 4, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Dismissing Action Without Prejudice: Plaintiffs are granted 30 days in which to pay the filing fee required to maintain this action or to file an amended motion and declaration under penalty of perjury in support of the motion to proceed in forma pauperis which provides any and all information supporting in forma pauperis status. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 1/4/10. (mjj) (kaj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sorrels et al v. J.P. Morgan Chase National Corporate Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMC Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equipoint Financial Network, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase National Corporate Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Sorrels
Represented By: Christopher A Villasenor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodi Sorrels
Represented By: Christopher A Villasenor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?