Taylor et al v. Waddell & Reed Inc et al

Plaintiff: Michael E Taylor and Kenneth B Young
Defendant: Waddell & Reed Inc, Waddell & Reed Financial, Inc, Waddell & Reed Development, Inc, Waddell & Reed Financial Advisors and Does
Case Number: 3:2009cv02909
Filed: December 28, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: William V. Gallo
Presiding Judge: Dana M. Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:206 Collect Unpaid Wages
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2012 167 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) granting in part and denying in part 142 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint; granting 149 , 150 Motions for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs Taylor and Young. Plaintiffs have 30 days from the date of this Order to file their revised Second Amended Complaint containing Mr. Jaegers claims. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 8/20/12. (cge)
April 27, 2012 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Request to Compel Contact Information of Putative Class Members. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 04/27/12.(cge)(jrd)
January 3, 2012 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant's 91 , 92 Motions for Partial Summary Judgment; denying as moot 97 Motion for Conditional Class Certification. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 01/03/12. (cge)
May 20, 2011 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendant's Application to Compel Production of Documents in Response to Plaintiffs' Counsel's Letter to Defendants' Financial Advisors.Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 05/20/11.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
August 12, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Specially Appearing Waddell & Reed Financial, Inc.'s and Waddell & Reed Financial Services, Inc.' Motions to Dismiss re 24 , 29 . Plaintiffs' request for jurisdictional discovery is denied. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/12/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor et al v. Waddell & Reed Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E Taylor
Represented By: Thomas D Rutledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth B Young
Represented By: Thomas D Rutledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waddell & Reed Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waddell & Reed Financial, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waddell & Reed Development, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waddell & Reed Financial Advisors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?