Guardado v. Hoshino et al

Petitioner: Paul Albert Guardado
Respondent: M Hoshino, M Cate, B Curry, G Neotti and Edmund G Brown, Jr
Case Number: 3:2009cv02913
Filed: December 28, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: Thomas J. Whelan
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 29, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. For these reasons, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's motion to proceed IFP on appeal. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 2/29/2012. (USCA Case Number 12-55239. Order electronically transmitted to US Court of Appeals. All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (akr)
January 17, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Adopting in Full 28 Report and Recommendation; Denying with Prejudice 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; and Denying 30 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. The Clerk of the Court shall close the case file. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 1/17/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
September 15, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 8 ; denies Respondents' motion to dismiss 4 and denies Petitioner's request for a stay 5 .In addition, the Court dismisses Respondents M. Hoshino, M. Cate, B. Curry, and Edmund G. Brown, Jr. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 9/15/2010.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guardado v. Hoshino et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Paul Albert Guardado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: M Hoshino
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: M Cate
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: B Curry
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: G Neotti
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Edmund G Brown, Jr
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?