March v. ABM Security Services,Inc.

Plaintiff: Adolphus March
Defendant: ABM Security Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv00082
Filed: January 12, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 14, 2012 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 167 Motion to Retax Costs. Costs taxed in the amount of $7,262.22 against Adolphus March. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 5/14/2012. (knb)
June 10, 2011 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 54 Motion for Summary Judgment. The court grants summary judgment in favor of ABM, and against Plaintiff, on all claims alleged in the FAC. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 06/10/11. (cge)
July 16, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER strking documents [48 and 49 . The Clerk of Court is instructed to strike from the Court docket entry Nos. 48 and 49. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 7/16/2010.(tkl)
March 24, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 31 motion to impose costs of the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference on Defendant for failing to negotiate in good faith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 3/24/2010. (tkl) (jrl).
January 12, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENIED 21 Opposed MOTION to Modify Mem. and Order and Transfer Order.(Signed by Judge Nancy F. Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 1/12/2010.]
January 7, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTED 8 MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of California, San Diego Division.(Signed by Judge Nancy F. Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 1/12/2010.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: March v. ABM Security Services,Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adolphus March
Represented By: David J Van Susteren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABM Security Services, Inc.
Represented By: Samantha Barlow Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?