Coulter v. Murrell et al

Plaintiff: Michael R Coulter
Defendant: Gregory L Murrell, Agda B Shelley and Michael Roddy
Case Number: 3:2010cv00102
Filed: January 14, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 14, 2011 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 54 Third Party Motion to Quash Subpoenas. Third Party Motion to Shorten Time for a ruling on the Motion to Quash is granted. Motion to Quash subpoenas served on Scripps Mercy and Scripps Memorial Hospital Custodians of Records to pro duce the medical records of Daniel T. Shelley is granted. Ms. Shelley's request for reasonable attorney's fees is granted. Court makes an award of $4,920.00 in atty's fees to be paid by Plaintiff Michael Coulter to Ms. Shelley's attorney, Joshua Herndon within 30 days of the filing date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 2/14/2011. (jah)
July 27, 2010 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Defendant Michael Roddy's 27 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 7/27/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jah)
July 13, 2010 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant Gregory Murrell's 24 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint with Prejudice; granting Defendant Murrell's 25 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. Court awards Defendant Murrell $6,372.90. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 7/13/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jah)
March 30, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendant's 5 Motion to Dismiss Portions of the Complaint; Granting Defendant's 6 Anti-Slapp Special Motion to Strike Portions of the Complaint. Murrell's motion to dismiss Pla's cause of action for violation of 1983 is granted w/o prejudice. Murrell's anti-SLAPP special motion to strike Pla's cause of action for fraud and conspiracy is granted w/ prejudice. Murrell is entitled to mandatory atty's fees and costs. Pla may file a Amended Compla int w/in 20 days of the filing of this Order. Consistent w/ this Order, the amended complaint will delete the causes of action from fraud and conspiracy against Murrell. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 3/30/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coulter v. Murrell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael R Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory L Murrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agda B Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Roddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?