Dorothy Peralta et al v. Countrywide Homes Loans, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Dorothy Peralta, Steven S. Bigverdi and James Moscoso
Defendant: Countrywide Homes Loans, Inc., Countrywide Bank, FSB and Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv00257
Filed: February 1, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Presiding Judge: Dana M. Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 16, 2011 166 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification re Document (439) in case 3:08-md-01988-DMS-WMC; re Document (127) in case 3:10-cv-00257-DMS-WMC. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 12/16/11. Associated Cases: 3:08-md-01988-DMS-WMC, 3:10-cv-00257-DMS-WMC(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)
November 16, 2009 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton Denying 18 Motion to Remand and 50 to Strike and Granting 29 Motion to Transfer (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/19/2009.][Transferred from California Central on 2/2/2010.]
October 30, 2009 61 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 56 Stipulation filed by Dorothy Peralta. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/30/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2009) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/19/2009.][Transferred from California Central on 2/2/2010.]
September 21, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND AND DEFENDANTS' AMENDED MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO TRANSFER AND MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTFFS' MOTION TO REMAND re 38 Stipulation, filed by Countrywide Homes Loans, Inc., Countrywide Bank, FSB, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/21/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2009) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/19/2009.][Transferred from California Central on 2/2/2010.]
August 21, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting re 21 Stipulation Extending deadline for Defendants Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. F/K/A Americas Wholesale Lender, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., and Countrywide Bank, FSB to respond to first amended complaint, filed by Countrywide Homes Loans, Inc., Countrywide Bank, FSB, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/21/09. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2009) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/19/2009.][Transferred from California Central on 2/2/2010.]
August 20, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/20/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2009) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/19/2009.] [Transferred from California Central on 2/2/2010.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dorothy Peralta et al v. Countrywide Homes Loans, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Peralta
Represented By: Robert Ira Spiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven S. Bigverdi
Represented By: Robert Ira Spiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Moscoso
Represented By: Robert Ira Spiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Homes Loans, Inc.
Represented By: David L. Permut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Bank, FSB
Represented By: David L. Permut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: David L. Permut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?