Medway v. Cate et al

Petitioner: Samuel Lee Medway
Respondent: Matthew Cate, Robert Doyle and Jerry Brown
Case Number: 3:2010cv00276
Filed: February 2, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Imperial
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 29, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 24 Motion for Certificate of Appealability as moot. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 12/29/2010. (USCA Case Number 10-56934. Order electronically transmitted to US Court of Appeals. All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (akr)
November 23, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Certificate of Appealability. The Court DENIES certificate of appealability as to all claims asserted by Petitioner in his Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 11/22/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service). (akr)
November 17, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, Adopting in Part 14 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 11/15/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medway v. Cate et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Samuel Lee Medway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew Cate
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Doyle
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jerry Brown
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?