Tran v. Gore et al

Plaintiff: Hoang Minh Tran
Defendant: William D Gore, Fredo Martinez, Jesse Holland and Omar Ortega
Case Number: 3:2010cv00464
Filed: March 2, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Presiding Judge: Dana M. Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 8, 2014 259 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 255 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Pending Appeal. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/8/2014. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
September 30, 2013 247 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Adopting 232 Report and Recommendation and Denying Defendant Robert Callahan's 145 Motion for Summary Judgment; (2) Adopting 233 Report and Recommendation and Granting Defendants Omar Ortega and Sarandi Marina's 180 M otion for Judgment on the Pleadings; (3) Adopting 237 Report and Recommendation and Granting 204 Defendant John Gill's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/29/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
April 15, 2013 216 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Denying 178 Motion for A Competency Hearing; and (2) Denying Ex Parte 183 Motion to Appoint Next Friend or Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick on 4/15/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
November 21, 2012 179 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 176 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick on 11/21/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tran v. Gore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hoang Minh Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William D Gore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fredo Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omar Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?