Uriarte v. City of Calexico et al

Plaintiff: Frank Uriarte
Defendant: City of Calexico and ROES
Case Number: 3:2010cv00498
Filed: March 9, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 19, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Directing Entry of Judgment. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/19/2012. (mtb)
May 23, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Defendant's 17 Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint. The defendant shall answer the FAC within the time provided under the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 5/23/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jer)
January 3, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting (Doc. 3 ) Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint; and Granting (Doc. 12 ) Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint. Defendant's motion to dismiss the complaint is Granted without prejudice. Plaintiff's motio n for leave to file an amended complaint is granted. Plaintiff must file a first amended complaint within 10 days of the filing of this Order. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 1/3/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (srm)
June 4, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Striking 9 First Amended Complaint: IT IS ORDERED striking plaintiffs First Amended Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court finds defendants motion to dismiss the complaint suitable for determination on the papers submitted and without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1. (Motions Submitted 3 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6)). Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 6/3/2010.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uriarte v. City of Calexico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Uriarte
Represented By: Carolina Veronica Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Calexico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?