Smith v. Uribe

Petitioner: Bryan D Smith
Respondent: Domingo Uribe
Case Number: 3:2010cv00545
Filed: March 10, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 14, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Adopting 16 Report and Recommendation and Dismissing Petition with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 2/11/2011.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)
November 18, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 14 Report and Recommendations, Denying 11 Motion to Dismiss without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 11/18/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)
November 9, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for Order Denying 11 MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice and Providing Notice Regarding Possible Dismissal of Petition for Failure to Exhaust State Court Remedies. Objections to R&R due by 11/17/2010, Replies due by 11/24/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 11/9/2010.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh) (jrl).
April 15, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel without Prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 4/15/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh) (av1).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Uribe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bryan D Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Domingo Uribe
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?