Pacific Maritime Freight, Inc. v. Foster et al

Plaintiff: Pacific Maritime Freight, Inc.
Defendant: Sonia L. Foster, The Foster Group, Inc. and DOES
Case Number: 3:2010cv00578
Filed: March 18, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 20, 2013 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Defendant's 104 Motion for Protective Order and Granting Plaintiff's Request for Sanctions. Defendants' request to continue the discovery deadline until Defendants obtain new counsel is Denied. Plaintiff's reques t for payment of expenses is Granted. Plaintiff's counsel must submit a declaration detailing the costs and attorney's fees it incurred in opposing the motion on or before 12/11/2013. Defendants may file a response to the declaration on or before 12/18/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 11/20/2013.(rlu)
May 29, 2013 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Attorney's Fees: The Court finds that the attorney's fees requested by Plaintiff are reasonable, with the exception of 6.75 hours. Foster Group is hereby Ordered to pay Plaintiff attorney's fees in the amount of $17,820. If Foster Group fails to do so within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this order, the default will be reinstated and default judgment may be entered against it. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 5/29/2013.(rlu)
March 26, 2013 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice 56 Motion for Default Judgment, with leave to renew if Foster Group fails to pay reasonable attorney's fees; and Conditionally Granting 81 Motion to Set Aside Default. Within 14 days of the entry of this Or der, Plaintiff shall submit its calculation of reasonable attorney's fees. Defendant Foster Group will then have 14 days to respond. If Foster Group fails to do so within the time allotted by the Court in its order, the default will be reinstated and default judgment entered against it. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 3/26/2013. (rlu)
December 28, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 35 Motion to Withdraw. Gordon & Rees, LLP is terminated as counsel of record for Defendants Sonia L. Foster and The Foster Group, Inc. The 34 stay of this case, entered on September 22, 2011 is hereby Lifted. All parties shall appear for a status conference on Tuesday, February 21, at 4:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 12/28/11. (ecs)(jrd)
November 17, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court Case Management Conference Order Regulating Discovery and Other Pretrial Proceedings. A Mandatory Settlement Conference shall be conducted on March 25, 2011 at 9:30 a.m. in the chambers of Magistrate Judge Barbara L. Major. Personal appearance of parties required. The final pretrial conference is scheduled on the calendar of the Honorable Barry Ted Moskowitz on January 3, 2012 at 4:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 11/17/2010.(jer)
August 24, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in part 4 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss.The Court DISMISSES without prejudice the claims for breach of contract and breach of the covenant of good faith and fair dealing against Ms. Foster in her individual c apacity. The Court declines to dismiss the claims for breach of fiduciary duty (generally), breach of fiduciary duty (phantom GSA listings), fraud, IIPEA, and trade-secret misappropriation and unfair competition against Ms. Foster in her individual capacity and the claims for fraud and IIPEA against The Foster Group. The motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 8/24/2010. (jer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacific Maritime Freight, Inc. v. Foster et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Maritime Freight, Inc.
Represented By: Clinton D Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonia L. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Foster Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?