Zhang v. United Technologies Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Hongwei Zhang
Defendant: United Technologies Corporation, Hamilton Sundstrand Corporation, Hamilton Sundstrand Power Systems, Inc., Stephen Page, Jr and Does 1 through 100
Case Number: 3:2010cv00660
Filed: March 26, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Presiding Judge: Frederick P. Stamp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 20, 2011 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER overruling Plaintiff's Objection to Magistrate Judge's September 6, 2011 Order. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/20/11.(lao)
October 17, 2011 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 96 Defendants' Ex Parte Motion to Take Deposition of Jayne O'Brien in the U. S. Courthouse. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 10/17/11. (Dembin, Mitchell)
September 6, 2011 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 55 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 9/6/11. (lao)
September 2, 2011 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on 51 Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute re: Defendants' Request that Plaintiff submit to a Mental Examination under Fed.R.Civ.P. 35. Plaintiff is required to submit to a mental examination under the terms and conditions provided in the appended Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 9/2/2011. (Dembin, Mitchell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zhang v. United Technologies Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hongwei Zhang
Represented By: Charles Edward Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Technologies Corporation
Represented By: Candice T Zee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton Sundstrand Corporation
Represented By: Candice T Zee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton Sundstrand Power Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Candice T Zee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Page, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?