Graham et al v. Overland Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Joyce Graham and Joyce Lampkin
Defendant: Overland Solutions, Inc. and DOES
Case Number: 3:2010cv00672
Filed: March 29, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2012 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Joint Motion For Preliminary Approval Of Class Action Settlement, Conditional Certification, Approval Of Class Notice, And Setting Of Final Fairness Hearing (Re Doc. 92 ): The Court approves and appoints Plaintiffs Joyce Graham and Jo yce Lampkin as the Class Representatives. The Court approves and appoints Cohelan Khoury & Singer and Michael P. Sousa as Class Counsel. The Court approves and appoints Rust Consulting, Inc., as the Claims Administrator to administrate the settlement pursuant to the terms of the Settlement Agreement. Objections must be filed with the District Court as described in the Notice of Pendency of Class Action and Proposed Settlement on or before 12/14/2012. The Final Approval Hearing is set for 1/29/20 13 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 03 before Judge Roger T. Benitez. All briefs in support of the proposed Settlement, Final Approval Hearing and attorneys' fees, litigation costs, class representative enhancements, and claims administration expenses, shall be filed with the Court on or before 1/14/2013. Any party to this case, including Class Members, may appear at the Final Approval Hearing in person or by counsel, and may be heard to the extent allowed by the Court. Pending further order of this Court, all proceedings in this matter except those contemplated herein and in the Settlement Agreement are stayed. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 9/12/2012. (mdc)
November 15, 2011 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 87 Joint Motion to Stay Litigation Deadlines Pending Court Approval of Settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 11/15/2011. (knb)
September 27, 2011 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part 83 Joint Motion for Reconsideration. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 8/20/2012 10:30 AM before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 7/23/2012. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/13/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 9/27/2011. (knb)
May 9, 2011 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' 24 Motion for Conditional Class Certification and Notice. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 5/9/2011. (knh)
July 14, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part 18 Joint Motion to Modify the Case Management Conference Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 7/14/10. (vet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graham et al v. Overland Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Graham
Represented By: Kimberly Dawn Neilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Lampkin
Represented By: Kimberly Dawn Neilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Overland Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Felicia Ruth Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?