Weiland Sliding Doors and Windows v. Panda Windows and Doors, LLC

Plaintiff: Weiland Sliding Doors and Windows, Inc.
Defendant: Panda Windows and Doors, LLC
Case Number: 3:2010cv00677
Filed: March 30, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2012 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 131 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Panda Windows and Doors, LLC's Third Amended Counterclaims with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/31/2012. (jao)(jrd)
January 23, 2012 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 117 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Defendant Panda Windows and Doors, LLC's Second Amended Counterclaims: Panda may file any amended counterclaim within 28 days of the date this Order is electronically docketed. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/23/12. (lmt)
August 29, 2011 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) denying 70 Weiland's Special Motion to Dismiss and (2) granting 70 Weiland's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss: Panda may file any amended counterclaim within 31 days of the date this order is electronically docketed. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/29/11. (lmt)(jrd)
August 10, 2011 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 87 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint: Plaintiff's claim against Eyal Avi Shoshan for direct infringement and its claims for inducement of infringement and contributory infringement are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Any amended complaint SHALL be filed within 28 days of this Order being electronically docketed. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/10/11. (lmt)
February 1, 2011 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 75 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 2/1/11. (lmt)
January 31, 2011 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 30 Motion to Strike Defendant's Preliminary Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/31/11. (lmt)
January 18, 2011 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 Plaintiff's Motion to File Second Amended Complaint: Plaintiff shall file its amended complaint within 14 days after this order is electronically docketed. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/18/11. (lmt)
October 28, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) granting in part and denying in part 23 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; (2) finding as moot 39 Defendant's Ex Parte Motion to Supplement; and (3) finding as moot 43 Motion to Appear Telephonically: the Court denies Plaintiff's motion to dismiss pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure § 425.16. The Court grants Plaintiff's motion for judgment on the pleadings based on the litigation privile ge and denies without prejudice the motion for judgment on the pleadings based on the patent-owner privilege and the Noerr-Pennington doctrine. Defendant's counterclaim for intentional interference with business relationships is dismissed with leave to amend. Defendant's motions to supplement and appear telephonically are dismissed as moot. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/28/10. (lmt)
October 4, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 24 Defendant's Ex Parte Motion to Continue the Hearing on Plaintiff's Special Motion to Dismiss: The Court vacates the hearing on the motion originally set for 10/14/10, and reschedules the hearing on the motion to 10/29/10, at 3:00 PM. Defendant shall file any opposition to the motion to dismiss by Friday, 10/8/10. Plaintiff shall file any reply by Thursday, 10/21/10. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/4/10. (lmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weiland Sliding Doors and Windows v. Panda Windows and Doors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weiland Sliding Doors and Windows, Inc.
Represented By: Neil F Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panda Windows and Doors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?