Hunter v. Oasis Financial Solutions, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Ross Hunter
Defendant: Oasis Financial Solutions, LLC and DOES
Case Number: 3:2010cv00724
Filed: April 6, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: William V. Gallo
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 25, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff is awarded $3,450.00 in attorneys fees and $350.00 in costs for a total of $3,800.00. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 4/25/2011. (mtb)
March 21, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting (Doc. 14 ) Report and Recommendation and Granting (Doc. 12 ) Motion for Default Judgment. Plaintiff's motion for default judgment is Granted in the amount of $75,000.00 plus attorney's fees in an amount to be determined. If attorney's fees are sought, plaintiff shall file a motion for attorney's fees on by April 4, 2011. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/21/2011. (srm) (av1).
August 23, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 5 Ex Parte Motion to Continue: Plaintiff shall have until September 3, 2010 in which to effectuate service of process. No further extensions of time to serve defendant shall be granted. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 8/23/2010. (mjj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter v. Oasis Financial Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ross Hunter
Represented By: Lara Ruth Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oasis Financial Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?