Kohler v. Flava Enterprises, Inc.

Plaintiff: Chris Kohler
Defendant: Flava Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv00730
Filed: April 7, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 13, 2012 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 131 Motion for Sanctions, Attorneys' Fees, Litigation Expenses and Costs. As the prevailing party, pursuant to Civ. L.R. 54.1 Dft may file a bill of costs w/ Clerk. Court denies Dft&# 039;s motion for an award of atty's fees and expenses. Clerk directed to enter judgment in favor of Dft and against Pla on Pla's claims for violation of the Americans with Disabilities Act, Pla's claim for violations of the Californa Unruh Act, and Pla's claim for violation of the California Disabled Persons Act. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 2/13/2012. (jah)
June 30, 2011 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 57 Motion to Quash; granting 75 Motion to Continue. Court grants Pla's motion to quash and further sets a Mandatory Settlement Conference for 7/11/2011 9:30AM in Courtroom G before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. Counsel will follow chambers' rules regarding settlement conferences, as posted on the Court's website. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 6/30/2011. (jah)
February 17, 2011 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot Defendants 20 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting Plaintiff's 23 Motion for leave to Amend/Correct. (rlu)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kohler v. Flava Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Kohler
Represented By: Lynn Hubbard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flava Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?