Lemons v. Unknown

Petitioner: Warren Lemons
Respondent: Unknown and A Hedgpeth
Case Number: 3:2010cv00807
Filed: April 15, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Monterey
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 14, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER (1) adopting Report and Recommendation, (2) denying Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, and (3) denying Certificate of Appealability. The action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 2/14/12.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
November 18, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 17 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 11/18/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
May 27, 2010 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE Without Prejudice. If Petitioner wishes to proceed with this action he must submit, no later than June 28, 2010, a Second Amended Petition which cures the pleading defects identified in this Order and in the Court's previous Order of dismissal. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 5/27/2010.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)
April 29, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Granting Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, and (2) Dismissing Petition without Prejudice and with Leave to Amend. To have this case reopended, Petitioner must, no later than June 28, 2010, file a First Amended Petition that cures the pleading deficiencies set forth above. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 4/28/2010.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)(kaj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lemons v. Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Warren Lemons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Unknown
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: A Hedgpeth
Represented By: Kyle Niki Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?