Fastek, LLC v. Steco et al

Plaintiff: Fastek, LLC
Defendant: Steco, Blue Tee Corp. and Sierra International Machinery, LLC
Case Number: 3:2010cv00972
Filed: May 5, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Bernardino
Presiding Judge: Michael M. Anello
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2011 253 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding 237 Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Documents. Having reviewed the parties' submissions, and considered the argument of counsel, the motion is Granted in Part and Denied in Part. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 9/29/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
September 27, 2011 251 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Granting 238 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike ; and Granting 240 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 9/27/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
September 26, 2011 248 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 200 Motion to Compel. Fastek will elect to withdraw the article or make the production,by September 30, 2011. Responsive documents will be produced by September 30, 2011 and may be produced "Confidential Attorney's Eyes Only" under the terms of the protective order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 9/26/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
September 21, 2011 242 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 210 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 9/21/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
July 18, 2011 162 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE and ORDER Providing Tentative Rulings Re 139 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Modify the Scheduling Order filed by Fastek, LLC. The Court tentatively grants Fastek's motion for leave to file a second amended complaint to add ASR LLC as a co-plaintiff. Counsel is advised the Courts rulings are tentative and the Court will entertain additional argument at the hearing on July 19, 2011. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 7/18/2011.(leh)
April 6, 2011 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Construing Disputed Claim Terms of United States Patent Nos. 7,172,382; 7,588,406; and 7,699,575. It is ordered that Defendants' objections to Dr. Pratt's declaration are overruled without prejudice as moot, and the 107 Ex Parte Motion to Strike Defendants' supplemental claim construction brief is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 4/6/2011. (leh) (jcj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fastek, LLC v. Steco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fastek, LLC
Represented By: Valerie W Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Tee Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sierra International Machinery, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?