Macias et al v. Perez et al

Plaintiff: Mario Macias and Maria Teresa Macias
Defendant: Spencer Rivas Perez, Susan Arcy, Estate of Susan Arcy, Ford Motor Company and DOES
Case Number: 3:2010cv00973
Filed: May 5, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Imperial
Presiding Judge: Michael M. Anello
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2011 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion to Stay. Plaintiffs shall file an opposition to the pending motion for summary judgment on or before October 21, 2011. Ford may file a reply on or before October 28, 2011. The Court shall determine the motion on the papers and without oral argument. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 10/11/2011. (mtb)
July 7, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Reports. Plaintiffs' expert, Mr. Bayer, must be available for his deposition by 7/29/2011. Expert discovery is extended only for the Defendant, and only until 7/29/2011. Defendant is also granted a short extension to file pretrial motions, which are now due by 8/19/2011. Plaintiffs' counsel is ordered to file a supplemental opposition by 7/12/2011. Failure to file the supplemental opposition will be deemed a concession that these expert designations should be stricken. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 7/7/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
March 4, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER - Granting 13 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 3/4/2011.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Macias et al v. Perez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Macias
Represented By: Fred Hanassab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Teresa Macias
Represented By: Fred Hanassab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer Rivas Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Arcy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Susan Arcy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Richard L. Stuhlbarg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?