Gardner v. GC Services, LP

Plaintiff: Brooke Gardner
Defendant: GC Services, LP
Case Number: 3:2010cv00997
Filed: May 10, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Alpine
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 2, 2012 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 62 Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement; granting 63 Motion for Attorney Fees. Court certifies the proposed class. Class Counsel awarded litigation costs in the amount of $20,000, settlement administrative costs in the amount of $17,000 and attys fees in the amount of $292,500. Court grants the request for an enhancement award and awards Plaintiff Brooke Gardner a class representative enhancement award in the amount of $3,000. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 4/2/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
November 1, 2011 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 54 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement. Pla's request to have Plaintiff Brooke Gardner appointed class representative is granted. Pla's request for preliminary approval of the proposed settl ement is granted. Pla's request to have law firms of Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Weinhaus & Potashnick, Cochran Cherry Givens Smith Lane and Taylor, and Jacobs Law Office appointed as class coinsel is granted. The form and manner of giving notice of the proposed settlement to the class members is approved. Final Approval Hearing on the proposed settlement set for 3/26/2012 10:30 AM before Judge Irma E. Gonzalez. Pla shall file a motion for final approval of the settlement, as well as any motions for fees awards and enhancement awards by 2/27/2012. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 11/1/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
July 6, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Defendant's 2 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, Motion to Change Venue and 2 Motion to Stay. Plaintiff's 4 Motion to Remand to State Court is denied. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 7/6/2010. (jah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gardner v. GC Services, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooke Gardner
Represented By: Jason M. Lindner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GC Services, LP
Represented By: Mariana Aguilar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?