Medivas, LLC et al v. Marubeni Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Medivas, LLC, Kenneth W. Carpenter, Joseph D. Dowling, T. Knox Bell, Dari Darabbeigi, Lindy Hartig, Sachio Okamura, William Summer, Paul Teirstein and William G. Turnell
Defendant: Marubeni Corporation and DOES
Case Number: 3:2010cv01001
Filed: May 10, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 4, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Granting Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards and (2) Denying Cross Petition to Vacate Awards. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 6/4/2014. (cap)
April 18, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants' 44 Motion to Remand the Fourth Cause of Action to California State Court. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 4/18/2014. (Certified copy sent to State Court via US Mail Service.) (jah)
February 28, 2011 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 5 Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration; Denying 7 Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand to State Court; and Granting 19 Ex Parte Application to Supplement the Record. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 2/28/2011. (amh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medivas, LLC et al v. Marubeni Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medivas, LLC
Represented By: Stephen L Schreiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth W. Carpenter
Represented By: Stephen L Schreiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph D. Dowling
Represented By: Stephen L Schreiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. Knox Bell
Represented By: Stephen L Schreiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dari Darabbeigi
Represented By: Stephen L Schreiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindy Hartig
Represented By: Stephen L Schreiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sachio Okamura
Represented By: Stephen L Schreiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Summer
Represented By: Stephen L Schreiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Teirstein
Represented By: Stephen L Schreiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William G. Turnell
Represented By: Stephen L Schreiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marubeni Corporation
Represented By: Bridget A. Moorhead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?