Nagast v. House of Metamorphosis et al

Plaintiff: Kebra Nagast
Defendant: House of Metamorphosis, Beverley Monroe, Roz Williams and Perales
Case Number: 3:2010cv01036
Filed: May 12, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Riverside
Presiding Judge: John A. Houston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 29, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT: It is hereby ordered that Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff is granted 45 days leave from the date this Order is filed in which to file a second amended compla int which cures all the deficiencies of the pleading. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a court approved § 1983 form complaint to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 11/29/2010. (Blank 1983 Form Mailed to Plaintiff)(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
July 14, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Sua sponte dismissing complaint for failing to state a claim pursuant to 28 USC 1915(e)(2)& 1915A. Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff is granted 45 days leave from the date this Order is filed in which to file a First Amended Complaint. (blank 1983 complaint form mailed to Plaintiff). (Order electronically transmitted to Matthew Cate, Secretary CDCR). Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 07/14/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
May 28, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and dismissing case without prejudice pursuant to 28 USC 1915(a). Plaintiff is granted 45 days from the ate this Order is Filed to either: (1) pay the entire $350 filing fee, or (2) file a new Motion to Proceed IFP. (blank motion to proceed in forma pauperis mailed to Plaintiff). Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 05/27/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nagast v. House of Metamorphosis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kebra Nagast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: House of Metamorphosis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverley Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roz Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?