Rosser v. Sanchez et al

Plaintiff: Larry Rosser
Defendant: H Sanchez, E Apodaca, R Crombie, R A Davis, R Acevedo, G J Janda, Dagdagen, Mendez, Tim Ochoa, D Edwards, John or Jane Doe and G G Giurbino
Case Number: 3:2010cv01037
Filed: May 12, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: John A. Houston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 4, 2012 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 110 Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel and to Reopen and Extend Discovery Period. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 6/4/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mtb)
January 24, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 43 Plaintiff's Motion for assistance in serving Complaint and Summons upon Defendant Mendez; and granting an extension of time to serve Defendant Mendez pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.4(m). (copy of Court� 39;s 07/14/10 Order, this Order, the Complaint, summons and blank USM Form 285 sent to Defendants' attorney for purposes of re-attempting service as to Defendant Mendez). Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 01/24/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
November 1, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) granting in part and denying part Plaintiff's motion for Court Order directing California Department of Corrections to supply Plaintiff with Defendants H. Sanchez's and Mendez's current address and (2) granting an extension o f time to serve Defendants H. Sanchez and Mendez pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.4(m). (copies of order, complaint, summonses and blank U.S Marshal 285 forms mailed to the Attorney General for purposes of re-attempting service as to Defendants H. Sanchez and Mendez.)(Order electronically transmitted to Matthew Cate, Secretary CDCR).. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 11/01/10.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
July 14, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, imposing no initial partial filing fee and garnishing balance from prisoner's trust account pursuant to 28 USC 1915(a); and directing U.S. Marshal to effect service of complaint pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(c)(3) & 28 USC 1915(d). (ifp package prepared). (Order electronically transmitted to Matthew Cate, Secretary CDCR). Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 07/14/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
June 4, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Dismissing Case without prejudice pursuant to 28 USC 1915(a) and granting 6 Plaintiff's motion to re-submit completed motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall have 45 days leave from the date this Order is Field to either: pay the entire $350 filing fee, or file a new motion to Proceed IFP(blank in forma pauperis formed mailed to plaintiff).. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 06/04/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosser v. Sanchez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Rosser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Apodaca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Crombie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Acevedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G J Janda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dagdagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Ochoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G G Giurbino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?