Rios v. Cate et al

Plaintiff: Carlos Rios
Defendant: Matthew Cate, George A Neotti, DOE 1, Rex Gregory, Junior Togurao, J Cabrera and J Keema
Case Number: 3:2010cv01064
Filed: May 14, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Michael M. Anello
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2012 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 86 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 10/3/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjt)
November 10, 2011 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 64 MOTION for Judgment filed by Carlos Rios. Plaintiff has filed this motion prematurely. The Defendants have not yet submitted a responsive pleading. Therefore, Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is untimely and is Denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 11/10/2011.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
February 8, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 34 Report and Recommendations of United States Magistrate Judge; And Granting in Part and Denying in Part 18 Motion to Dismiss. All claims in Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, except his ADA claim against Defendant in their official capacities, are dismissed with prejudice. In addition, Plaintiff is only entitled to seek declaratory and injunctive relief in connection with his ADA claim; damages are not recoverable. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 2/8/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
July 28, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 19 Motion for TRO and denying 19 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 7/28/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jer)
June 9, 2010 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing U.S. Marshal to Effect Service of the First Amended Complaint. It is hereby ordered that Defendants are ordered to reply to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint within the time provided. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 6/9/2010. (Pro per package prepared)(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
May 20, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Imposing Initial Partial Filing Fee and Garnishing Balance; and Dismissing Civil Action For Failing to State a Claim. Plaintiff is granted forty-five days leave from the date this Or der is filed in which to file a First Amended Complaint, which cures all the deficiencies of pleading. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 5/20/2010. (Order electronically transmitted to Matthew Cate, Secretary CDCR) (Blank 1983 form mailed to Plaintiff) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh) (kaj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rios v. Cate et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George A Neotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rex Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Junior Togurao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Cabrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Keema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?