Smith et al v. CRST Van Expedited, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Charles Smith, Hector Casas and Barry Newmann
Defendant: CRST Van Expedited, Inc., CRST, Inc. and DOES
Case Number: 3:2010cv01116
Filed: May 21, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: John A. Houston
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 30, 2014 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiffs' 101 Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 4/30/2014. (knb)
January 14, 2013 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 81 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs; granting 88 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Award of Incentive Payments to Class Representatives. Court finds the settlement fair, adequate and free of collusion, Court grants final approval of the settlement.. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 1/14/2013. Case is closed. (jah)
November 20, 2012 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Overruling Class Member James Cole's Objections and denying Intervention and Consolidation re 86 Notice of Intent to Appear filed by James Cole. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 11/20/12.(cge)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. CRST Van Expedited, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Smith
Represented By: Douglas J Campion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Casas
Represented By: Douglas J Campion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Newmann
Represented By: Douglas J Campion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRST Van Expedited, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher C McNatt, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRST, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?