Scott v. Astrue

Plaintiff: William Taylor Scott
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Case Number: 3:2010cv01167
Filed: May 28, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 5, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Plaintiff's 19 Motion for Summary Judgment is denied and Defendant's 20 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is granted. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 6/1/2012.(knb)
June 3, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 9 Motion for Leave to Serve Process Outside of the 120 Day Period. Plaintiff shall have until July 15, 2011 to serve Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 6/3/2011. (knh)
June 3, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 2 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and Referring Matter to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 6/2/2010. (knh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Taylor Scott
Represented By: Mary Adele Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?