Vaughan v. State of California et al

Plaintiff: Michael Vaughan
Defendant: State of California, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Calipatria State Prison, Leland McEwen and Katrina Ball
Case Number: 3:2010cv01179
Filed: June 1, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Imperial
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2013 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 66 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 8/22/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjt)
February 14, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 51 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION granting in part and denying in part 45 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; Overruling Plaintiff's and Defendants' Objections 52 , 53 . The Court also DENIES AS MOOT Defendants request todecline exercising supplemental jurisdiction. Furthermore, the Court DENIES Plaintiffs request for leave to amend. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 2/12/2013.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjt)
June 26, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in part re 33 Report and Recommendation, sustaining defendants' 34 Objections, and granting 26 Motion to Dismiss. If Plaintiff decides to file an amended complaint as to only his Eighth Amendment claims, he must do so by July 30, 2012. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 6/25/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mtb)
July 21, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) adopting re 14 Report and Recommendation as modified; (2) Granting in part defendants' motion to dismiss; (3) Granting plaintiff's request for leave to amend. If Plaintiff chooses to file an amended complaint, he must do so no later than August 19, 2011. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/21/2011. (mtb)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vaughan v. State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Vaughan
Represented By: April A Verlato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calipatria State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leland McEwen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katrina Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?