Ryan v. Hyden et al

Plaintiff: Mykal S Ryan
Defendant: Timothy M Hyden, Matthew S Toth, Lee M Quick and York - Poquoson Sheriffs
Trustee: Timothy M Hyden
Case Number: 3:2010cv01206
Filed: June 7, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Michael M. Anello
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 12, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 20 Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiff is advised this matter is closed and no further filings will be accepted. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 5/12/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jer)
November 2, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing Remaining Defendant Lee M. Quick and Terminating Action: The Court finds that Defendant Quick, the sole remaining defendant in this action, should be dismissed based on Plaintiff's failure to effect proper service pursuant to Ru le 4(m) and failure to prosecute this action as to Defendant Quick pursuant to Rule 41(b). Accordingly, the Court hereby Dismisses Defendant Quick without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is instructed to terminate the case file. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 11/2/2010.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
August 31, 2010 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 4 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, improper venue, and failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. For the reasons stated herein, the Court grants Defendant's motion to dismiss. Plaintiff's claims are Dismissed as to Defendant York-Poquoson Sheriffs. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 8/31/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ryan v. Hyden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mykal S Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy M Hyden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew S Toth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee M Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York - Poquoson Sheriffs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Timothy M Hyden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?