Rouse v. Campagna et al

Plaintiff: Carl Livingston Rouse
Defendant: Anthony Campagna, Andy Spear, Charles Adair, William Cahill, Dennis Hodges and Pitucci
Case Number: 3:2010cv01304
Filed: June 18, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Referring Judge: Bernard G. Skomal
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion For Extension Of Time To File Amended Complaint And Denying Motion For Reconsideration (Re Doc. 10 ): Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint must be received by the Court no later than 2/21/2011. If Plaintif f chooses not to file a Second Amended Complaint by 2/21/2011, this action will remain dismissed without prejudice for failing to state a claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(e)(2) and Section 1915A(b). Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 1/7/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
November 19, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Sua Sponte Dismissing First Amended Complaint For Failing To State A Claim And For Seeking Monetary Damages Against Immune Defendants Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B) & § 1915A(b) (Re Doc. 8 ): Plaintiff is granted 30 days leave from the date this Order is stamped "Filed" in which to file a Second Amended Complaint which cures all the deficiencies of pleading noted. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 11/19/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; per Order, a blank 1983 Second Amended Complaint form also was sent to Plaintiff.) (mdc)
June 24, 2010 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING Civil Action For Failing To Pay Filing Fees Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. Section 1914(a) And For Failing To Move In Forma Pauperis Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(a): The Court grants Plaintiff 45 days leave from the date this Order is f iled to: (a) prepay the entire $350 civil filing fee in full; or (b) complete and file a Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. If Plaintiff fails to either prepay the $350 civil filing fee or complete and submit the Motion to Proceed In Form a Pauperis within that time, this action shall remain dismissed without prejudice and without further Order of the Court. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 6/24/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; per Order, a blank IFP motion form also was sent to Plaintiff.) (mdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rouse v. Campagna et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Livingston Rouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Campagna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Spear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pitucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?