Brinson v. Marrero et al
Plaintiff: David Brinson
Defendant: E Marrero, Pederson, McBride, Cortez, D Huffman, K J Smith, E A Contreras, D Brown, D Morris, C Newman, T Kabban-Miller, P Cowan, W Suglich, E Franklin, K J Allen, N Grannis, R Manuel, D Foston and G Savala
Case Number: 3:2010cv01332
Filed: June 23, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Marilyn L Huff
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2012 Filing 75 Non-Opposition re #74 Notice to Withdraw His Complaint filed by D Brown, E A Contreras, Cortez, P Cowan, E Franklin, D Huffman, T Kabban-Miller, E Marrero, McBride, D Morris, C Newman, Pederson, K J Smith, W Suglich. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kral, Timothy) (ag).
February 10, 2012 Filing 74 NOTICE of Voluntary Withdrawal of Complaint by David Brinson (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(skh)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #65 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint; and denying #72 Motion to Strike. The Court grants Defendants motion to dismiss Plaintiffs second amended complaint with regards to Plaintiffs Fourteenth Amendment cause of action with prejudice and grants Defendants motion to dismiss Plaintiffs Eighth Amendment cause of action without prejudice. The Court grants Plaintiff 30 days leave to amend his complaint. The denies Plaintiffs motion to strike. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 01/10/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag) (cap).
December 30, 2011 Filing 72 MOTION to Strike Declaration of R. Cobb contained in #65 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by David Brinson. Filed nunc pro tunc 12/22/11. (skh)
December 30, 2011 Filing 71 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #61 Second Amended Complaint by David Brinson. Filed nunc pro tunc 12/22/11. (skh)
December 30, 2011 Filing 70 Notice of Document Discrepancies by Judge Marilyn L. Huff Accepting Document: Motion for Extension of Time & Motion to Strike from David Brinson. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation, Civ. L. Rule 7.1: Lacking memorandum of points and authorities in support as a separate document, OTHER: Missing Certificate of Service. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is to be filed nunc pro tunc to date received.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(skh)
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #68 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #65 MOTION to Dismiss. Opposition due by 12/19/2011. Reply due by 1/3/2012. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 11/18/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (jcj).
November 17, 2011 Filing 68 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #65 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by David Brinson. Filed nunc pro tunc 11/14/11. (skh)
November 17, 2011 Filing 67 Notice of Document Discrepancies by Judge Marilyn L. Huff Accepting Document: Motion for Extension of Time from David Brinson. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation, Civ. L. Rule 7.1: Lacking memorandum of points and authorities in support as a separate document, OTHER: Response was due 11/09/11. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is to be filed nunc pro tunc to date received.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(skh)
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 SCHEDULING ORDER: Responses due by 11/9/2011 and Replies due by 11/16/2011 as to #65 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 10/19/2011.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag) (jcj).
October 18, 2011 Filing 65 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by D Brown, E A Contreras, Cortez, P Cowan, E Franklin, D Huffman, T Kabban-Miller, E Marrero, McBride, D Morris, C Newman, Pederson, K J Smith, W Suglich. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration Of Robert Cobb, #3 Exhibit A through C to Declaration of Robert Cobb, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Proof of Service)(Farag, Shareef) (skh).
October 6, 2011 Filing 64 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (Attachments: #1 IFP Letter). IFP package prepared and sent to Plaintiff.(skh)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #62 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to File Initial Responsive Pleading. Answer due by 11/4/2011. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 09/30/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag) (jrl).
September 29, 2011 Filing 62 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Up To And Including November 4, 2011 by D Brown, E A Contreras, Cortez, P Cowan, E Franklin, D Huffman, T Kabban-Miller, E Marrero, McBride, D Morris, C Newman, Pederson, K J Smith, W Suglich. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration Of Shareef S. Farag, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Proof of Service)(Farag, Shareef) (skh).
September 23, 2011 Filing 61 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against D Brown, E A Contreras, Cortez, P Cowan, E Franklin, D Huffman, T Kabban-Miller, E Marrero, McBride, D Morris, C Newman, Pederson, K J Smith, W Suglich, filed by David Brinson. (skh) (av1).
September 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #53 Motion to Dismiss. The Court grants Defendants motion to dismiss Plaintiffs Fourteenth Amendment claim and grants Defendants motion to dismiss Plaintiffs Eighth Amendment claim. The Court grants Plaintiff thirty days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint to state a claim for relief. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 09/07/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag)
August 8, 2011 Filing 59 REPLY to Response to Motion re #53 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by D Brown, E A Contreras, Cortez, P Cowan, E Franklin, D Huffman, T Kabban-Miller, E Marrero, McBride, D Morris, C Newman, Pederson, K J Smith, W Suglich. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Certificate of Service)(Farag, Shareef) (ecl).
July 28, 2011 Filing 58 RESPONSE in Opposition re #53 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by David Brinson. (ecl)
July 21, 2011 Filing 57 NOTICE of Change of Address by David Brinson (ecl)
June 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #55 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #53 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Responses due by 8/1/2011 and Replies due by 8/8/2011. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 06/28/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag) (jcj).
June 24, 2011 Filing 55 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #53 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by David Brinson. (ecl)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER: Motions Submitted re #53 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. The Motion Hearing set for 07/11/2011 is vacated. Responses due by 6/27/2011 and Replies due by 7/5/2011 as to #53 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 06/08/2011(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag) (jcj).
June 6, 2011 Filing 53 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by D Brown, E A Contreras, Cortez, P Cowan, E Franklin, D Huffman, T Kabban-Miller, E Marrero, McBride, D Morris, C Newman, Pederson, K J Smith, W Suglich. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Proof of Service)(Farag, Shareef) (ecl).
May 25, 2011 Filing 52 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against D Brown, E A Contreras, Cortez, P Cowan, E Franklin, D Huffman, T Kabban-Miller, E Marrero, McBride, D Morris, C Newman, Pederson, K J Smith, W Suglich, filed by David Brinson. (ecl) (av1).
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #50 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to File an Amended Complaint. If Plaintiff wishes, he is directed to file an amended complaint on or before 06/03/2011. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 04/27/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag) (jcj).
April 25, 2011 Filing 50 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time by David Brinson. Nunc pro tunc 4/18/11. (ecl)
April 25, 2011 Filing 49 Notice of Document Discrepancies by Judge Marilyn L. Huff Accepting Document: Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time from David Brinson. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Case closed; Motion to Dismiss granted on 3/18/11; missing original signature. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is to be filed nunc pro tunc to date received.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecl)
April 6, 2011 Filing 48 NOTICE of Change of Address by David Brinson (ecl)
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting Defendants' #11 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 3/18/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu) (mam).
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying #42 Motion to Stay the Proceedings; denying #44 Motion for Writ of Mandamus and granting an extension of time for Plaintiff to Oppose Defendants' #11 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff is directed to file his opposition to the Defendants motion to dismiss on or before 03/8/2011. Defendants are directed to file any reply on or before 03/15/2011. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 2/22/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag) (jcj).
February 16, 2011 Filing 45 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by David Brinson. (ecl)
February 16, 2011 Filing 44 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus by David Brinson. Nunc pro tunc 2/9/11. (ecl)
February 16, 2011 Filing 43 Notice of Document Discrepancies by Judge Marilyn L. Huff Accepting Document: Motion for Writ of Mandamus from David Brinson. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation, OTHER: missing proof of service. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is to be filed nunc pro tunc to date received.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecl)
February 16, 2011 Filing 42 MOTION to Stay and Abeyance by David Brinson. Nunc pro tunc 2/9/11. (ecl)
February 16, 2011 Filing 41 Notice of Document Discrepancies by Judge Marilyn L. Huff Accepting Document: Motion for Stay and Abeyance from David Brinson. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is to be filed nunc pro tunc to date received.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecl)
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and denying #38 Motion to Temporarily Suspend Proceedings. Plaintiff is directed to file his opposition to the motion to dismiss on or before 2/22/2011. Defendants are directed to file any reply on or before 2/28/2011. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 01/12/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag) (av1). Modified on 1/14/2011 to note that a copy of the complaint, document no. #1 and Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, document no. #10 were mailed to the Plaintiff (ag).
January 11, 2011 Filing 39 NOTICE by K J Allen, D Brown, E A Contreras, Cortez, P Cowan, D Foston, E Franklin, N Grannis, D Huffman, T Kabban-Miller, R Manuel, E Marrero, McBride, D Morris, C Newman, Pederson, G Savala, K J Smith, W Suglich of Change of Firm Name (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Proof of Service)(Ramirez, Eugene) (ecl).
January 4, 2011 Filing 38 MOTION that the Court Temporarily Suspend Proceedings, Specifically the Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by David Brinson. Nunc pro tunc 12/16/10. (ecl)
January 4, 2011 Filing 37 Notice of Document Discrepancy by Judge Marilyn L. Huff Accepting Document: Motion that the Court Temporarily Suspend Proceedings, Specifically the Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss from David Brinson. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation, Civ. L. Rule 7.1: Lacking memorandum of points and authorities in support as a separate document. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is to be filed nunc pro tunc to date received.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecl)
December 30, 2010 Filing 36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by David Brinson. (ecl)
December 30, 2010 Filing 35 NOTICE of Change of Address by David Brinson (ecl)
December 14, 2010 Filing 34 NOTICE by K J Allen, D Brown, E A Contreras, Cortez, P Cowan, D Foston, E Franklin, N Grannis, D Huffman, T Kabban-Miller, R Manuel, E Marrero, McBride, D Morris, C Newman, Pederson, G Savala, K J Smith, W Suglich of Change of Handling Attorney (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Proof of Service)(Ramirez, Eugene) (ecl).
December 1, 2010 Filing 33 Letter from David Brinson. Nunc pro tunc 11/19/10. (ecl)
December 1, 2010 Filing 32 Notice of Document Discrepancy by Judge Marilyn L. Huff Accepting Document: Letter from David Brinson. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Per L.R. 77.2, request not grantable by the clerk without further direction from the Judge. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is to be filed nunc pro tunc to date received.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecl)
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Responses due by 1/3/2011 and Replies due by 1/10/2011. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 12/01/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag) (jrl).
November 24, 2010 Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by David Brinson. (ecl)
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: The Court, sua sponte, grants an extension and directs Plaintiff to file his opposition on or before 12/8/2010. Defendants may file their reply on or before 12/15/2010. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 11/17/2010.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag) (jrl).
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: Motion Submitted re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. The Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2010 is vacated. The Court directs Plaintiff to file a response in opposition to Defendants motion on or before 11/15/2010. Defendants may file their reply on or before 11/22/2010. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 11/10/2010.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag) (jrl).
November 9, 2010 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Brinson. K J Smith waiver sent on 9/21/2010, answer due 11/22/2010. (ecl)
November 9, 2010 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Brinson. G Savala waiver sent on 9/21/2010, answer due 11/22/2010. (ecl)
November 9, 2010 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Brinson. Pederson waiver sent on 9/21/2010, answer due 11/22/2010. (ecl)
November 9, 2010 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Brinson. C Newman waiver sent on 9/21/2010, answer due 11/22/2010. (ecl)
November 9, 2010 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Brinson. D Morris waiver sent on 9/21/2010, answer due 11/22/2010. (ecl)
November 9, 2010 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Brinson. McBride waiver sent on 9/21/2010, answer due 11/22/2010. (ecl)
November 9, 2010 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Brinson. E Marrero waiver sent on 9/21/2010, answer due 11/22/2010. (ecl)
November 9, 2010 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Brinson. T Kabban-Miller waiver sent on 9/21/2010, answer due 11/22/2010. (ecl)
November 9, 2010 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Brinson. D Huffman waiver sent on 9/21/2010, answer due 11/22/2010. (ecl)
November 9, 2010 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Brinson. E Franklin waiver sent on 9/21/2010, answer due 11/22/2010. (ecl)
November 9, 2010 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Brinson. P Cowan waiver sent on 9/21/2010, answer due 11/22/2010. (ecl)
November 9, 2010 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Brinson. Cortez waiver sent on 9/21/2010, answer due 11/22/2010. (ecl)
November 9, 2010 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Brinson. E A Contreras waiver sent on 9/21/2010, answer due 11/22/2010. (ecl)
November 9, 2010 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Brinson. D Brown waiver sent on 9/21/2010, answer due 11/22/2010. (ecl)
November 9, 2010 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Brinson. W Suglich waiver sent on 9/21/2010, answer due 11/22/2010. (ecl)
November 5, 2010 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address by David Brinson (ecl)
October 27, 2010 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by K J Allen, D Brown, E A Contreras, Cortez, P Cowan, D Foston, E Franklin, N Grannis, D Huffman, T Kabban-Miller, R Manuel, E Marrero, McBride, D Morris, C Newman, Pederson, G Savala, K J Smith, W Suglich. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Proof of Service)(Coleman, Susan) (ecl).
October 26, 2010 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by K J Allen, D Brown, E A Contreras, Cortez, P Cowan, D Foston, E Franklin, N Grannis, D Huffman, T Kabban-Miller, R Manuel, E Marrero, McBride, D Morris, C Newman, Pederson, G Savala, K J Smith, W Suglich. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Proof of Service)(Coleman, Susan) Atty notified to refile using matching login and s/ signature (ecl). Modified on 10/28/2010 to term motion(ecl).
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. K J Allen answer due 11/22/2010; D Foston answer due 11/22/2010; N Grannis answer due 11/22/2010; R Manuel answer due 11/22/2010. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 10/25/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag) (jrl).
October 21, 2010 Filing 8 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Initial Responsive Pleading by K J Allen, D Foston, N Grannis, R Manuel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Proof of Service)(Coleman, Susan) (lmt)
September 30, 2010 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Brinson. N Grannis served on 9/23/2010, answer due 10/14/2010. (ecl)
September 30, 2010 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Brinson. R Manuel served on 9/23/2010, answer due 10/14/2010. (ecl)
September 30, 2010 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Brinson. K J Allen served on 9/23/2010, answer due 10/14/2010. (ecl)
September 30, 2010 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Brinson. D Foston served on 9/23/2010, answer due 10/14/2010. (ecl)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER (1) Granting (Doc. #2 ) Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; and (2) Directing U.S. Marshal to Effect Service of Complaint. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 7/30/2010. IFP package sent to filer. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (srm) (av1). Modified on 8/20/2010 to update docket text (srm).
June 23, 2010 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Brinson. (ecl)
June 23, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 350. Fee not paid, IFP submitted.), filed by David Brinson.(ecl) (jcj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brinson v. Marrero et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Brinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Marrero
Represented By: Eugene P Ramirez
Represented By: Shareef Farag
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pederson
Represented By: Eugene P Ramirez
Represented By: Shareef Farag
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McBride
Represented By: Eugene P Ramirez
Represented By: Shareef Farag
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cortez
Represented By: Shareef Farag
Represented By: Eugene P Ramirez
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Huffman
Represented By: Eugene P Ramirez
Represented By: Shareef Farag
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K J Smith
Represented By: Eugene P Ramirez
Represented By: Shareef Farag
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E A Contreras
Represented By: Eugene P Ramirez
Represented By: Shareef Farag
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Brown
Represented By: Eugene P Ramirez
Represented By: Shareef Farag
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Morris
Represented By: Eugene P Ramirez
Represented By: Shareef Farag
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Newman
Represented By: Eugene P Ramirez
Represented By: Shareef Farag
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Kabban-Miller
Represented By: Eugene P Ramirez
Represented By: Shareef Farag
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P Cowan
Represented By: Eugene P Ramirez
Represented By: Shareef Farag
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W Suglich
Represented By: Eugene P Ramirez
Represented By: Shareef Farag
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Franklin
Represented By: Shareef Farag
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Represented By: Eugene P Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K J Allen
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Represented By: Eugene P Ramirez
Represented By: Shareef Farag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N Grannis
Represented By: Eugene P Ramirez
Represented By: Shareef Farag
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Manuel
Represented By: Eugene P Ramirez
Represented By: Shareef Farag
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Foston
Represented By: Eugene P Ramirez
Represented By: Shareef Farag
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Savala
Represented By: Eugene P Ramirez
Represented By: Shareef Farag
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?