Applied Professional Training, Inc. v. Mira Costa College et al

Plaintiff: Applied Professional Training, Inc.
Defendant: Mira Costa College, Teleskills, LLC, Burt Price, Thomas Cawley, Xavier Uribe, Mara Glenn, Janis Aydelott and DOES
Case Number: 3:2010cv01372
Filed: June 29, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Presiding Judge: Dana M. Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 2, 2012 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 133 Motion for Determination of Dispute re: Deposition of Janis Aydelott. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 2/2/12. (Dembin, Mitchell)
January 9, 2012 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 122 Joint Motion for Discovery Dispute re Written Discovery Requests Seeking Certain Financial Info from Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 1/9/2012. (Dembin, Mitchell)
December 21, 2011 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 92 Plaintiff's Application for Attorney Fees Relating to Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 12/21/11. (Dembin, Mitchell)
August 12, 2011 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on 58 Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute. For the reasons provided in this Order, Defendants are ordered to comply with Requests for Production 6 through 12 within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 8/12/2011. (Dembin, Mitchell)
November 2, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 24 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for leave to conduct discovery (Response due by 11/5/2010. Reply briefs due by 11/12/2010.) Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 11/2/10. (lao)
September 28, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 7 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/28/10. (lao)
September 8, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) construing Motion to Dismiss as Motion for Summary Judgment under Rule 56 and (2) Denying 9 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for leave to conduct Discovery. Plaintiffs are free to file an affidavit pursuant to Rule 56(f) in conjunction wi th or in lieu of their opposition to the pending motion. If the Teleskills Defendants wish to raise additional arguments in light of the Court's construction of their motion as one for summary judgment, they shall withdraw the pending motion, and file a new motion that includes all arguments they wish to raise. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/8/10. (lao) (jrl).
September 3, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court DOCUMENT STRICKEN - ORDER granting, in part, and denying, in part, 9 Plaintiff's Motion to conduct Early Discovery. If the parties seek to modify dates related to the pending Motion to Dismiss, the parties shall contact the chambers of the Honorable Dana M. Sabraw. Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 9/3/10. (lao) (Main Document 11 replaced on 9/3/2010) (lao). Modified on 9/3/2010 to reflect document stricken per chambers; order to follow (lao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Applied Professional Training, Inc. v. Mira Costa College et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Applied Professional Training, Inc.
Represented By: John D Alessio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mira Costa College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teleskills, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burt Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Cawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Uribe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mara Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janis Aydelott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?