Creative Compounds, LLC v. S103, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Creative Compounds, LLC and S103, Inc.
Defendant: Matthias Boldt, Joseph Rodrigues and S.A.N. Nutrition Corp.
Case Number: 3:2010cv01411
Filed: July 6, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The (Doc. 27 ) Motion for Sanctions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 filed by Defendants Matthias Boldt and S.A.N. Nutrition Corp. is denied. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 11/15/2011. (mdc)
August 31, 2011 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendants' (Doc. 20 ) Motion to Dismiss is granted. The Complaint is dismissed without leave to amend. Plaintiffs' (Doc. 21 ) Ex Parte Application for an extension of time to file an opposition to the Motion to Dismiss is granted. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/29/2011. (mdc) Modified on 9/1/2011 - Corrected minor typographical error in text entry; NEF was not regenerated. (mdc)
March 29, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiffs' (Doc. 15 ) Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint is granted. Plaintiffs shall file the proposed Third Amended Complaint attached to Plaintiffs' Motion (Doc. 15 -1) by no later than ten days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 3/29/2011. (mdc)
January 12, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendants' (Doc. 8 ) Motion to Dismiss on statute of limitations grounds is granted. The Complaint is dismissed. Plaintiffs may file a motion for leave to file an amended complaint within thirty days from the date of this Order. In the event no motion is filed, the Court will close the case. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 1/12/2011. (mdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Creative Compounds, LLC v. S103, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Creative Compounds, LLC
Represented By: Susan Lynn Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S103, Inc.
Represented By: Susan Lynn Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthias Boldt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Rodrigues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.A.N. Nutrition Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?