Douglas v. Smelosky et al

Plaintiff: Robert Douglas
Defendant: Michael Smelosky, Walker and Valenzuela
Case Number: 3:2010cv01464
Filed: July 12, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Michael M. Anello
Referring Judge: Bernard G. Skomal
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2015 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 105 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/3/15. (dlg)
September 3, 2014 81 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel Pursuant to 28 USC 1915(e)(1). Attorney David Zugman appointed for Robert Douglas. Pro Bono Counsel shall file, within fourteen (14) days of this Order file a formal written Notice of Substitution of Attorney signed by both Plaintiff and his newly appointed counsel. Such substitution shall be considered approved by the Court upon its filing, and Pro Bono Counsel shall thereafter be considered attorney of record for Plaintiff for all purposes during further p roceedings before this Court and in this matter only. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/3/2014. (Mr. Zugman served via U.S. Mail at Law Office of Burcham and Zugman, 964 5th Avenue, Suite 300, San Diego, California, 92101)(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
July 16, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Adopting 70 Report and Recommendation; (2) Denying In Part and Granting In Part 66 Motion for Summary Judgment; (3) Resetting Pretrial Dates and Deadlines. Magistrate Judge Skomal is directed to set a mandatory settlement confe rence at the earliest opportunity. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/10/2014. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 10/17/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/15/2014. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
September 30, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Plaintiff's Motion For Leave to File Supplemental Documents; Denying as Moot 58 Motion for motion for leave to file supplemental documents in opposition to Defendant Valenzuela's motion for summary judgment. Fact discovery is reopened for the limited purposes of conducting additional discovery with regard to the news transcript submitted by Plaintiff in his motion for leave to file supplemental documents. The new fact discovery cutoff is December 27, 2013. The Court requests that Defendant Valenzuela withdraw (Doc. 41 ) pending motion for summary judgment and refile by 1/31/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 9/30/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
October 9, 2012 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 47 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 10/9/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (srm)
April 2, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 27 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Plaintiff's present motion does not change this analysis. Accordingly, the Court must once again Deny Without Prejudice Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 4/2/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
August 23, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Motion to Dismiss; Adopting 14 Report and Recommendation. It is ordered that Plaintiff's claim for relief against Defendant Smelosky is dismissed without prejudice, and with leave to amend. Plaintiff's claims for damage s against all Defendants in their official capacities are dismissed with prejudice, and without leave to amend. If Plaintiff desires to amend his claim against Defendant Smelosky to remedy the deficiencies identified in the Report, he must file an am ended complaint within30 days. If Plaintiff does not file an amended complaint within the time permitted, the only claim that will proceed in this action is his claim against Defendant Valenzuela in his individual capacity. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 8/23/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh) (jrl).
June 22, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 13 Motion to Appoint Counsel. For the reasons stated herein, the Court denies without prejudice Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 6/22/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
August 27, 2010 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; (2) denying 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel; and (3) Directing US Marshal to Effect Service of Complaint. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 8/27/2010. (Order electronically transmitted to Matthew Cate, Secretary CDCR) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (Pro Per Packaged Mailed)(leh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Douglas v. Smelosky et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Smelosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valenzuela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?