Park et al v. U.S. Bank National Association (TTEE) et al

Plaintiff: Sean M Park and Michelle Park
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association (TTEE), Credit Suisse Financial Corporation, Old Republic Title Company, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems-"MERS" (Beneficiary), Select Portfolio Servicing, DOES and Quality Loan Service Corporation (TTEE)
Case Number: 3:2010cv01546
Filed: July 26, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 13, 2011 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The (Doc. 97 ) Motion to Dismiss filed by Lender Processing Services, Inc. is granted. The (Doc. 100 ) Motion to Dismiss filed by U.S. Bank National Association, Credit Suisse Financial Corporation, Select Portfolio Servicing, and Mortgage E lectronic Registration Systems is granted in part and denied in part. All claims against Lender Processing Services, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association, Credit Suisse Financial Corporation, and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems are dismissed without prejudice. All claims against Select Portfolio Servicing are dismissed without prejudice, except the intentional misrepresentation, negligent misrepresentation, promissory estoppel, and Section 17200 claims. The moving Defendants' request for an award of attorneys' fees and costs is denied. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 9/13/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
April 13, 2011 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 61 Ex Parte Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting 82 Amended Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint; denying 73 Motion to Strike; denying as moot 45 Motion to Dismiss Complaint; denying as moot 47 Motion For E xpansion Of Time; denying as moot 55 Motion for Extension of Time; denying as moot 56 Ex Parte Motion for Hearing, denying as moot 56 Ex Parte Motion for Permanent Injunction, denying as moot 56 Ex Parte Motion for TRO, denying as moot 56 E x Parte Motion for Order to Show Cause; denying as moot 71 Motion for Leave to File; denying as moot 72 Motion For Leave To File Excess Pages; denying as moot 84 Ex Parte Motion To Strike. No later than Twenty (20) Days from the date of this Order, Plaintiffs shall file the Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 4/13/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)
November 19, 2010 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The (Docs. 18 , 30 , 32 ) Motions for Default Judgment are denied. The (Docs. 17 , 33 ) Motions to Set Aside Default are granted. The (Docs. 20 , 27 , 37 ) Motions to Strike are denied. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(c) , default (Doc. 11 ) is set aside at to Defendants Credit Suisse Financial Corporation, Quality Loan Service Corporation, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, and Select Portfolio Servicing. Defendants Credit Suisse Financial Corporation, Quali ty Loan Service Corporation, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, and Select Portfolio Servicing shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint no later than 10 days from the date this Order is filed. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 11/19/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Park et al v. U.S. Bank National Association (TTEE) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean M Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association (TTEE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Title Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems-"MERS" (Beneficiary)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation (TTEE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?