Park et al v. Wachovia Mortgage, FSB et al

Plaintiff: Sean M Park and Michelle Park
Defendant: Wachovia Mortgage, FSB, Wachovia Mortgage Corporation, Executive Trust Services (Trustee), Chicago Title Company Park Camino Branch and Does
Case Number: 3:2010cv01547
Filed: July 26, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2011 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The (Doc. 118 ) Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint filed by Wells Fargo on behalf of Wachovia Mortgage, FSB and Wachovia Mortgage Corporation is granted. Plaintiffs' claims against Wachovia Mortgage, FSB and Wachovia Mortgage Corporation are dismissed. The (Doc. 119 ) Motion to Dismiss Defendant Mark G. Rackers is granted. Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint is dismissed as to Defendant Mark G. Rackers. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 9/30/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
April 13, 2011 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 83 Motion For Leave To File 2nd Amended Complaint; denying as moot 90 Ex Parte Motion (Application) for Stay of Expungement of Pendency; granting 99 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File; denying 106 Motion to Strike. No later than fifteen days from the date of this Order, Plaintiffs shall file the proposed Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 4/13/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)
January 12, 2011 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Chicago Title Company's (Doc. 38 ) Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default and Executive Trust Services' (Doc. 45 ) Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default are granted. Plaintiffs' (Docs. 25 , 27 , 37 ) Motions for Default Judgme nt are denied. Plaintiffs' (Docs. 19 , 65 ) Motions to Strike are denied. Defendant Wells Fargo Bank's (Doc. 11 ) Motion to Dismiss is granted. Plaintiffs' claims one through fourteen against Wells Fargo are dismissed. Plaintiffs ma y file a motion for leave to file a Second Amended Complaint, accompanied by a proposed Second Amended Complaint, within thirty days from the date of this order. Plaintiffs' (Doc. 44 ) Motion for Extension of Time is denied as moot. Plaintiffs' (Doc. 70 ) Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint is denied. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 1/12/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
December 7, 2010 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiffs' (Doc. 51 ) Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Order to Show Cause, Defendant Wells Fargo Banks (Doc. 55 ) Ex Parte Application for a Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction and (Doc. 58 ) Supplemental Briefing are denied. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 12/7/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
September 8, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The (Doc. 17 ) Ex Parte Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 9/8/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Park et al v. Wachovia Mortgage, FSB et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean M Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Mortgage, FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Trust Services (Trustee)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Title Company Park Camino Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?