Perea v. Imperial County

Petitioner: Jaime Perea
Respondent: Imperial County
Case Number: 3:2010cv01565
Filed: July 23, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Imperial
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Nature of Suit: Mandamus and Other
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 46 Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time Under Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(5). Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 7/10/2013. (USCA Case Number 12-56578. Order electronically transmitted to US Court of Appeals. All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (akr)
October 4, 2012 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 48 Motion to Reconsider and/or (COA) Certificate of Appeal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 10/4/2012. (USCA Case Number 12-56578. Order electronically transmitted to US Court of Appeals. All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (akr)
March 8, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER: The Court finds that additional briefing regarding Petitioner's custody status is necessary. Therefore, the parties are to file briefs, not to exceed two pages, no later than March 13, 2012. The briefs should address the basis for Petitioner's current custody and how his custody relates to the underlying 2008 conviction for which he seeks federal habeas relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 3/8/12.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)
June 13, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 12 Motion to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 6/13/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)
October 5, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE Without Prejudice And With Leave To Amend: If Petitioner wishes to pursue this case, he must, no later than 12/6/2010, file a Second Amended Petition that cures the pleading deficiencies outlined in this Order. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 10/5/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; per Order, a blank Second Amended 2241 Petition for also sent to Petitioner.) (mdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perea v. Imperial County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jaime Perea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Imperial County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?