Kerr v. American Home Mortgage Servicing Inc

Plaintiff: Linda M Kerr
Defendant: American Home Mortgage Servicing Inc
Case Number: 3:2010cv01612
Filed: August 2, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 11 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claims under RESPA, TILA and FTCA are dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff's remaining claims are based on state law and the Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over them. Accordingly, Plaintiff's remaining claims are dismissed without prejudice to their re-filing in the appropriate court. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 9/22/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)
August 9, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 8 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 8/8/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)
August 3, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 3 Application for TRO and Setting Hearing for Preliminary Injunction: Plaintiff must serve Defendant with all documents she has filed in this matter and this Order by 8/12/10 and file proof of service by 8/17/10. If the documents are timely served and proof of service is filed, the hearing on the request for preliminary injunction will be set for 9/27/10. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 8/2/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kerr v. American Home Mortgage Servicing Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda M Kerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Home Mortgage Servicing Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?