Blucher et al v. Piccolo et al
Plaintiff: Claudia Jo Gorham, James Buch, Michael Ranieri, Vivian Paulsen, Stacey Ranieri, Thomas Koenig, Robert Mendoza, James Quigley, Sauwan Leung, Stephen Melvin, Katharina Prineau, David Greenlees, Brian Tanahashi, Jennifer Horton, Karen Von Der Ahe, Joshua Jackson, Robert Nields, Montee Skorich, Michael George, Dennis Duling, Jackye L. Raiger, Petrina Session, Robynn Ward, Joanna Foley Blucher, Ray Paley, SCG Private Investors Fund, LLC, Darryl Wortham, Kishaya K. Perry, Thomas Elias, Patricia Wilks, Karen Tanahashi, Kevin Baroni, Kerwin Session, Nancy Duling, Eldelmira Medina, Paula Cirillo, Shawn Ward and Vince Pruneau
Defendant: Five Star Capital Markets, LLC, Jim Piccolo, DOES 1-50; inclusive, Craig Cottrell and Noveau Riche Corporation
Case Number: 3:2010cv01638
Filed: August 5, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Referring Judge: Thomas J Whelan
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1332pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court pursuant to 28 USC 1447. The Court awards Plaintiffs' attorney's fees and costs in the amount of $1650.00. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 10/5/2010. cc: San Diego County Superior Court (tkl) (jcj).
October 4, 2010 Filing 10 NON Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Craig Cottrell, Five Star Capital Markets, LLC, Noveau Riche Corporation, Jim Piccolo. (Beckstrand, Dwight) (tkl).
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Vacating Early Neutral Evaluation Conference: In light of the pending motion to remand, the Court finds it inappropriate to hold an ENE at this time. Accordingly, the ENE is hereby vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 9/3/2010.(leh)(jrl).
September 2, 2010 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Karen Von Der Ahe, Kevin Baroni, Joanna Foley Blucher, James Buch, Paula Cirillo, Dennis Duling, Nancy Duling, Thomas Elias, Michael George, Claudia Jo Gorham, David Greenlees, Jennifer Horton, Joshua Jackson, Thomas Koenig, Sauwan Leung, Eldelmira Medina, Stephen Melvin, Robert Mendoza, Robert Nields, Ray Paley, Vivian Paulsen, Kishaya K. Perry, Katharina Prineau, Vince Pruneau, James Quigley, Jackye L. Raiger, Michael Ranieri, Stacey Ranieri, SCG Private Investors Fund, LLC, Kerwin Session, Petrina Session, Montee Skorich, Brian Tanahashi, Karen Tanahashi, Robynn Ward, Shawn Ward, Patricia Wilks, Darryl Wortham. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit, #3 Declaration, #4 Proof of Service)(Weintraub, Richard) Contacted attorney re use of CM/ECF account on 9/3/2010 (knh).
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 9/22/2010 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 8/11/2010.(tkl) (jrl).
August 11, 2010 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Jim Piccolo.(Beckstrand, Dwight) (tkl).
August 11, 2010 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Noveau Riche Corporation.(Beckstrand, Dwight) (tkl).
August 11, 2010 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Five Star Capital Markets, LLC.(Beckstrand, (tkl).
August 11, 2010 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Craig Cottrell.(Beckstrand, Dwight) (tkl).
August 11, 2010 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Craig Cottrell, Five Star Capital Markets, LLC, Noveau Riche Corporation, Jim Piccolo.(Beckstrand, Dwight) (tkl).
August 5, 2010 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California County of San Diego, North County Division, case number 37-2010-00055001-CU-PO- NC. ( Filing fee $ 350 Receipt number 16651), filed by Jim Piccolo, Nouveau Riche Corporation, Craig Cottrell, Five Star Capital Markets, LLC [Complaint and First Amended Complaint can be found in the Notice of Removal](yeb) Modified on 8/26/2010 to correct filing parties (jcj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blucher et al v. Piccolo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Jo Gorham
Represented By: Richard Alan Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Buch
Represented By: Richard Alan Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ranieri
Represented By: Richard Alan Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivian Paulsen
Represented By: Richard Alan Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Ranieri
Represented By: Richard Alan Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Koenig
Represented By: Richard Alan Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Mendoza
Represented By: Richard Alan Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Quigley
Represented By: Richard Alan Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sauwan Leung
Represented By: Richard Alan Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Melvin
Represented By: Richard Alan Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katharina Prineau
Represented By: Richard Alan Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Greenlees
Represented By: Richard Alan Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Tanahashi
Represented By: Richard Alan Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Horton
Represented By: Richard Alan Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Von Der Ahe
Represented By: Richard Alan Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Jackson
Represented By: Richard Alan Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Nields
Represented By: Richard Alan Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montee Skorich
Represented By: Richard Alan Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael George
Represented By: Richard Alan Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Duling
Represented By: Richard Alan Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackye L. Raiger
Represented By: Richard Alan Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Petrina Session
Represented By: Richard Alan Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robynn Ward
Represented By: Richard Alan Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanna Foley Blucher
Represented By: Richard Alan Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Paley
Represented By: Richard Alan Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCG Private Investors Fund, LLC
Represented By: Richard Alan Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Wortham
Represented By: Richard Alan Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kishaya K. Perry
Represented By: Richard Alan Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Elias
Represented By: Richard Alan Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Wilks
Represented By: Richard Alan Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Tanahashi
Represented By: Richard Alan Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Baroni
Represented By: Richard Alan Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerwin Session
Represented By: Richard Alan Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Duling
Represented By: Richard Alan Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eldelmira Medina
Represented By: Richard Alan Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Cirillo
Represented By: Richard Alan Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Ward
Represented By: Richard Alan Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vince Pruneau
Represented By: Richard Alan Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Five Star Capital Markets, LLC
Represented By: Dwight Beckstrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Piccolo
Represented By: Dwight Beckstrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-50; inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Cottrell
Represented By: Dwight Beckstrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noveau Riche Corporation
Represented By: Dwight Beckstrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?