Travelers Property Casualty Company of America et al v. Everest Indemnity Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Company and St. Paul Mercy Insurance Company
Defendant: Everest Indemnity Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, Probuilders Specialty Insurance Company, American Safety Indemnity Company, American International Specialty Lines Insurance Company, CRV El Centro Partners, L.P., Innovative Communities, Inc and DOES
Case Number: 3:2010cv01649
Filed: August 6, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 9, 2011 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 73 Request to Exercise Jurisdiction Over Anti-SLAPP Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 5/9/2011. (jer)(jrd)
March 29, 2011 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 03/29/11.(jpp)
September 30, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Hearing on Order to Show Cause and Requiring Supplemental Briefing. It is still unclear whether the Court has diversity jurisdiction over this action. Therefore, the Court orders Plaintiffs to file a supplemental response on or befo re October 18, 2010. The Court CONTINUES the hearing on the OSC to October 22, 2010 at 11:00 am. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, there shall be no oral argument and no personal appearances are necessary. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 9/29/2010.(jer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America et al v. Everest Indemnity Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: A. Eric Aguilera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Company
Represented By: A. Eric Aguilera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Paul Mercy Insurance Company
Represented By: A. Eric Aguilera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everest Indemnity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steadfast Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Probuilders Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Safety Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American International Specialty Lines Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRV El Centro Partners, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovative Communities, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?