National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA v. Tokio Marine & Nichido Fire Insurance Co, LTD et al

Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Defendant: Tokio Marine & Nichido Fire Insurance Co, LTD and DOES
Case Number: 3:2010cv01733
Filed: August 19, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2016 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 69 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. In sum, the threshold issue of whether the Completed Operations Exclusion applies was previously decided by the Court in El Cajon, and the Court here finds that Plaintiff has not demonstrated ad equate reason to further litigate the issue. Accordingly, Plaintiff is estopped from further arguing this issue, and because Plaintiff's claims all depend on the success of such argument the Court grants with prejudice Defendant's MTD. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/27/2016. (kcm)
November 8, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) granting 34 Motion to Strike; (2) granting 34 Motion to Dismiss the First Claim for Declaratory Judgment; and (3) granting 34 Motion to Stay: The first claim of the amended complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. In addition, Defendant 's motion to stay pending the resolution of the pending state court action is GRANTED. Upon completion of the underlying action, Plaintiff SHALL FILE a notice with this Court within 10 days of the date the verdict is rendered or within 10 days after settlement in the underlying action is reached. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/8/11. (lmt)
May 16, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Motion to Alter or Amend and/or Grant Relief from Order: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff leave to amend its complaint. Any amended complaint SHALL BE FILED within 14 days of this order being electronically docketed. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/16/11. (lmt)
February 1, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss: Plaintiff's first cause of action is dismissed. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 2/1/11. (lmt)
October 18, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 8 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court: The Court finds that there is complete diversity between the parties. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/18/10. (lmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA v. Tokio Marine & Nichido Fire Insurance Co, LTD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Represented By: Andrew D Herold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tokio Marine & Nichido Fire Insurance Co, LTD
Represented By: Michael Murad Salem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?