Sorokin v. Bravo et al

Plaintiff: Julia Sorokin and Louis A. Bravo
Defendant: Sheriff's Department of San Diego County, Carlos Vasquez, Lenice Lopez, Las Colinas Women Detention Facility and County of San Diego
Case Number: 3:2010cv01842
Filed: September 3, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Referring Judge: William V. Gallo
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court adopts the (Doc. 38 ) Report and Recommendation in its entirety and the (Doc. 32 ) Motion for Sanctions filed by Defendants is granted. The case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 7/25/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
April 6, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Granting In Part Defendants' Request For Sanctions, (2) Setting New Discovery Dates, And (3) Vacating The April 15, 2011 Settlement Conference (Re Doc. 25 ): The Court orders Plaintiffs to pay Defendants $1,122.50. Plaintiffs mus t pay this sanction by 4/18/2011 and must file with the Court a Notice of Payment of Sanctions by 4/25/2011. The Court orders Plaintiffs to appear for their depositions on 4/22/2011. Both Plaintiffs also are required to provide written responses to D efendants' Requests for Production of Documents and Special Interrogatories by 4/20/2011. The Court vacates the Settlement Conference currently scheduled for 4/15/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 4/6/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc) (jcj).
February 4, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiffs' (Doc. 9 ) Motion for Summary Judgment is denied. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 2/4/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sorokin v. Bravo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Sorokin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis A. Bravo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff's Department of San Diego County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenice Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Colinas Women Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Diego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?