Simon v. Laettner et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Leonard B. Simon
Defendant: Christian D. Laettner, Brian K. Davis, Grizzlies Acquisition Holdings, LLC and Ball Street Ventures, LLC
Case Number: 3:2010cv01854
Filed: September 7, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: Marilyn L. Huff
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Overpayment and Enforcement of Judgment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2010 6 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Ball Street Ventures, LLC, Brian K. Davis, Grizzlies Acquisition Holdings, LLC, Christian D. Laettner (ag) (jrl).
October 22, 2010 5 Request for Entry of Clerk Default against Defendants. (Sampson, Bryan) issued a discrepancy order (ag).
October 22, 2010 4 Request for Entry of Clerk Default against Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Bryan D. Sampson in Support of Application for Entry of Default, # 2 Proof of Service)(Sampson, Bryan) (ag).
October 13, 2010 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leonard B. Simon. All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service Served on Ball Street Ventures, # 2 Proof of Service Served on Christian D.Laettner, # 3 Proof of Service Served on Brian K. Davis, # 4 Proof of Service Served on Grizzlies Acquisition Holdings, LLC)(Sampson, Bryan)(ag).
September 8, 2010 2 Summons Issued as to Ball Street Ventures, LLC, Brian K. Davis, Grizzlies Acquisition Holdings, LLC, Christian D. Laettner. (ag)
September 7, 2010 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 17720.), filed by Leonard B. Simon.(yeb) (mam).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simon v. Laettner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard B. Simon
Represented By: Bryan D Sampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian D. Laettner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian K. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grizzlies Acquisition Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ball Street Ventures, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?