Martin v. Naval Criminal Investigative Service et al

Plaintiff: Carolyn Martin
Defendant: Naval Criminal Investigative Service, Mark D. Clookie, Wade Jacobson, Marine Corps West Field Office, Sean Sullivan, Marine Corps Recruit Depot San Diego, Gerald "Jerry&quo Martin, Ray Mabus and John Does
Case Number: 3:2010cv01879
Filed: September 9, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 11, 2013 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff's Objections to Discovery Dispute Order No. 1 (Doc. 96 ) are OVERRULED. Plaintiff's Objections to Discovery Dispute Order No. 2 (Doc. 102 ) are SUSTAINED. The Magistrate Judge's 1/22/2013 Order is VACATED. Within thi rty (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff may file a renewed motion to extend the deadline to file amended pleadings. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 6/11/2013. (mdc)(Modified on 6/12/2013 - Notified appeals clerk re this filing.)(mdc)(jrd)
December 14, 2012 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Determining Joint Motion For Discovery Dispute No. 1, Granting In Part And Denying In Part Plaintiff's Motion To Compel (Re Doc. 92 ): The court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Plaintiff's motion to compel. The USAO shall produce a privilege log by 1/9/2013 in accordance with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 12/14/2012. (mdc)
August 1, 2012 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Motion to Dismiss the First Supplemental Complaint (Doc. 78 ) filed by the United States is DENIED. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/1/2012. (mdc)
May 3, 2012 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Supplemental Brief Seeking Leave to File Supplemental Pleading filed by Plaintiff Carolyn Martin (Doc. 64 ) is granted. No later than ten days from the date of this Order, Plaintiff may file the proposed first supplemental complaint (Doc. 61 -2 at 2-23). The Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint (Doc. 53 ) is denied as moot. The Cross-Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal filed by the United States on behalf of Defendants Mark D. Clookie, Wade Jacobson, Ray Mabus, Gerald Martin, Naval Criminal Investigative Service, and Sean Sullivan (Doc. 55 ) is denied. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 5/3/2012. (mdc) Modified on 5/3/2012 - Notified the appeals clerk re this filing. (mdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Naval Criminal Investigative Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Martin
Represented By: John David Blair-Loy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naval Criminal Investigative Service
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark D. Clookie
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wade Jacobson
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marine Corps West Field Office
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Sullivan
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marine Corps Recruit Depot San Diego
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald "Jerry&quo Martin
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Mabus
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?