Woodall v. Schwarzenegger et al

Plaintiff: Shawn Woodall
Defendant: Arnold Schwarzenegger, Debra Bowen, Matthew Cate and George Neotti
Case Number: 3:2010cv01890
Filed: August 31, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Referring Judge: Bernard G. Skomal
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2012 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Defendants Pederson and Soto's 112 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Defendants Pederson and Soto shall serve and file an Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint within the time prescribed by FED.R.CIV.P. 12(a)(4)(B). Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 9/12/2012. (rlu)
June 4, 2012 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 109 Motion for Appointment of Counsel and stay of action. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 6/4/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)
February 3, 2012 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Dismissing claims and defendants for failure to state a claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2); and (2) Directing U.S. Marshal to effect service of Second Amended Complaint pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 4(c)(3) & 28 U.S.C. § 1915(d) upon remaining defendants. Defendants Cate, Contreras, Olson, Gonzalez, Nelson and Vasquez are Dismissed from this action. The Clerk shall issue a summons as to Plaintiffs 35 Second Amended Complaint upon the remaining Defendants and shall and forward it to Plaintiff along with a blank U.S. Marshal Form 285 for each Defendant. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 2/3/12.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)
December 28, 2011 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing claims and defendants for failure to state a claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). Plaintiff may choose to proceed with the claims that the Court has found survive the sua sponte screening process or he may attempt to amend as to those claims in which the Court found deficiencies. Plaintiff has thirty (30) days to inform the Court of his intentions. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 12/28/11.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)
September 19, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Denying 34 Motion for Appointment of Counsel ; (2) Denying 37 Motion to Exclude the Plaintiff from paying Pacer fees; (3) Denying 39 Motion to Attach Exhibits to Second Amended Complaint; (4) Granting in part and Denying in part 43 45 Motion for Order to San Diego Sheriff declaring the plaintiff to be a self-represented litigant. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 9/19/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)
March 9, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Granting Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; (2) Dismissing First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2); and (3) Denying Motion to Transfer Court Case File and Motion to Amend Caption/Subst itute Parties as Moot. Plaintiff is granted thirty days leave from the date this Order is "filed" in which to file a Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 3/9/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service. Mailed Plaintiff a Court approved § 1983 complaint form.)(jer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodall v. Schwarzenegger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Woodall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Schwarzenegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Neotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?