-AJB (HC) Downs v. California Board of Prison Terms II

Petitioner: Gregory Downs
Respondent: California Board of Prison Terms II
Case Number: 3:2010cv02029
Filed: September 28, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Imperial
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Marilyn L. Huff
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 12, 2011 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) denying Certificate of Appealability (Doc. No. 59 ); (2) denying as moot Petitioner's Motion for Discovery (Doc. No. 57 ). The Court DENIES Petitioner's request for a certificate of appealability and DENIES as moot Petitioner's motion for discovery. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 5/12/2011. (Order electronically transmitted to US Court of Appeals. All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (akr)
March 25, 2011 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; denying 19 Petitioner's motion for summary judgment; denying 19 Petitioner's motion for preliminary injunction; denying 26 Petitioner's motion for appointment of counsel; denying 26 Petitioner's motion to be released from prison. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 3/25/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu) Corrected text on 3/25/2011 (rlu).
September 28, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, CASE TRANSFERRED to Southern District of California. signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/28/2010. (Sant Agata, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 9/29/2010.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: -AJB (HC) Downs v. California Board of Prison Terms II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gregory Downs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: California Board of Prison Terms II
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?