Melbye v. Accelerated Payment Technologies, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Richard B. Melbye
Defendant: Accelerated Payment Technologies, Inc. and DOES
Case Number: 3:2010cv02040
Filed: October 1, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 27, 2012 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 149 Defendant's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, A New Trial or to Alter the Judgment. Because the record contains sufficient evidence to support the jurys verdict under each of these standards, the Court hereby DENIES Defendants motion in its entirety. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 11/27/2012. (sjt)
January 11, 2012 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 35 Motion for Summary Judgment. Court denies Dft's motion as to the 1st, 4th, 6th, 7th, 8th and 9th causes of action. Court grants Dft's motion as to the 2nd, 3rd, and 5th causes of action. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 1/11/2012. (jah)
December 22, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 38 Motion for leave to amend complaint. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 12/22/11. (ecs) (jcj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melbye v. Accelerated Payment Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard B. Melbye
Represented By: Louis J A Storrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accelerated Payment Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Arthur F Silbergeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?